Dogfen lywodraethu OKEHAMPTON COLLEGE PARENT TEACHER FRIENDS ASSOCIATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28TH SEPTEMBER 1981 AS AMENDED 25TH SEPTEMBER 1985 25TH APRIL 1991 6 NOVEMBER 1996 AND 13 NOVEMBER 2001
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY) AND AS AN ANCILLARY THERETO AND IN FURHTERANCE OF THIS OBJECT THE ASSOCIATION MAY (I) FOSTER MORE EXTENDED RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF AND PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; (II) TO ENGAGE IN ACTIVITIES WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS ATTENDING IT.
Maes buddion
CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.