Dogfen lywodraethu GATEHOUSE EDUCATIONAL TRUST LIMITED

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29/12/1980 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/02/1981 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/04/1981 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 08/05/1981 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/03/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/02/2015 as amended on 21 Jun 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS BETWEEN THE AGES OF TWO AND NINETEEN. B, IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE FOREGOING TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN A SCHOOL FOR CHILDREN OF ALL RACES, CREEDS, SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES AND LEVELS OF INTELLECT AND ABILITY AND TO EDUCATE AND INSTRUCT THE CHILDREN INDIVIDUALLY AND TOGETHER, BUT WITHOUT STREAMING OR SEGREGATION, IN ORDER TO HELP THEM SO TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBER OF SOCIETY.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.