Dogfen lywodraethu ELIMINATION OF LEUKAEMIA FUND OR ELF
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 12TH MAY 1981 AS AMENDED 9TH APRIL 1985, 1ST OCTOBER 1987, 17TH APRIL 1991, 4TH AUGUST 1997 AND 25 JUNE 2007
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) TO ADVANCE THE CURE AND TREATMENT OF LEUKAEMIA AND OTHER RELATED DISEASES WITHIN THE UNITED KINGDOM BY PROMOTING RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES AND TREATMENT OF SUCH DISEASES AND PUBLISHING THE RESULTS OF ANY SUCH RESEARCH (B) TO RELIEVE PERSONS SUFFERING FROM LEUKAEMIA AND OTHER BLOOD RELATED DISORDERS (C) TO RELIEVE THE DEPENDANTS OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM LEUKAEMIA AND OTHER BLOOD RELATED DISORDERS WHO ARE IN HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS AND (D) TO SUPPORT SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE ORGANIZATIONS AND BODIES WITHIN THE UNITED KINGDOM HAVING SIMILAR OBJECTS TO THE CHARITY AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Maes buddion
UNITED KINGDOM
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.