Dogfen lywodraethu THE LONDON WILDLIFE TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26TH NOV 1981 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS PASSED ON 20TH OCT 1984, 24TH OCT 1987 AND 1ST NOV 1995, NOW ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 20 NOV 2010 as amended on 26 Sep 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(1) TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION, CREATION, MAINTENANCE AND STUDY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OF PLACES AND OBJECTS OF ORNITHOLOGICAL ENTOMOLOGICAL, BOTANICAL, ZOOLOGICAL, GEOLOGICAL, ARCHAEOLOGICAL OR SCIENTIFIC INTEREST OR OF NATURAL BEAUTY IN GREATER LONDON AND ELSEWHERE. (2) TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICE OF CONSERVATION OF FLORA AND FAUNA, AND THE APPRECIATION OF NATURAL BEAUTY PARTICULARLY IN URBAN AREAS. (3) TO PROMOTE, ORGANISE AND CARRY ON STUDY AND RESEARCH IN THE PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICE OF THE CONSERVATION OF NATURE AN THE USE OF NATURAL RESOURCES AND TO PUBLICISE THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Maes buddion
GREATER LONDON AND ELSWHERE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.