Dogfen lywodraethu MEDWAY VOLUNTEER CENTRE
Rhif yr elusen: 284288

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20/01/1982 AS AMENDED ON 10/03/1982 AS AMENDED ON 16/06/1983 AS AMENDED ON 17/12/1997 AS AMENDED ON 24/06/2003 AS AMENDED ON 13/06/2009 AS AMENDED ON 14/07/2010 AS AMENDED ON 28/07/2011 AS AMENDED ON 19/04/2012
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO UNDERTAKE VOLUNTARY WORK IN SOCIAL SERVICES AND SIMILAR CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES AMONGST THOSE CLASSES IN NEED THEREOF.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
CHATHAM, ROCHESTER, STROOD AND ADJACENT PARISHES WITHIN THE BOROUGH OF MEDWAY,
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.