Dogfen lywodraethu BESTOBELL-MEGGITT WELFARE TRUST
Rhif yr elusen: 284376

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
TRUST DEED DATED 7TH SPTEMBER I948 SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 6TH OCTOBER 1949 AS VARIED BY DEEDS OF 28TH JANUARY 1982,28TH JANUARY 1988,2ND NOVEMBER 1992 AND 3RD FEBRUARY 1993
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE RELIEF OF HARDSHIP, FINANCIAL NEED OR SICKNESS OF THE BENEFICIARIES (AS DEFINED IN THE DEED DATED 28TH JANUARY 1982).
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.