Dogfen lywodraethu BRITISH PAEDIATRIC ASSOCIATION
Rhif yr elusen: 285235
Elusen a dynnwyd
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
RULES OF THE ASSOCIATION ADOPTED ON 22ND APRIL 1982 AS AMENDED 12TH APRIL 1984, 18TH APRIL 1985, 4TH APRIL 1990 AND 8TH APRIL 1992 (UNCONFIRMED) AND AMENDED 10TH APRIL 1992, 21ST APRIL 1993 AND 13TH APRIL 1994
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN CHILD HEALTH AND PAEDIATRICS AND TO RELIEVE SICKNESS BY PROMOTING THE IMPROVEMENT IN PAEDIATRIC PRACTICE.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.