Dogfen lywodraethu QUEEN'S HALL CHARITY

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
SCHEME OF THE COMMISSIONERS DATED 26 APRIL 1999 AS AMENDED BY TRUSTEES RESOLUTIONS DATED 22 MAY 2007 AND 20 MAY 2008 as amended on 22 May 2019 as amended on 17 May 2022 as amended on 30 May 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A RECREATION GROUND FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; AND 2. THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DECIDE.
Maes buddion
PARISH OF NORTH WEALD BASSETT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.