Dogfen lywodraethu THE CRYSTAL PALACE FOUNDATION
Rhif yr elusen: 285563

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
THE CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 31ST AUGUST 1982 AS AMENDED 30TH JUNE 1988, 28TH MARCH 2002, 29TH MAY 2003, 29TH APRIL 2004 AND 18 JUNE 2009
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY AND CHARACTER OF THE CRYSTAL PALACE AND THE SURROUNDINGS. (B) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, THE PRESERVATION AND IMPROVEMENT OF FEATURES OF GENERAL PUBLIC AMENITY OR HISTORIC INTEREST.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
THE CRYSTAL PALACE AND THE SURROUNDINGS
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.