Dogfen lywodraethu THE ROYAL MASONIC TRUST FOR GIRLS AND BOYS
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
TRUST DEED DATED 08/09/1982 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 16/02/2006 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 13/08/2007 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 16/05/2013 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 21/03/2016
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY:- (A) THE ASSISTANCE OF SUCH CHILDREN (INCLUDING ADOPTED CHILDREN AND STEP-CHILDREN AND CHILDREN OF THE FAMILY) OF ANY AGE OF FREEMASONS UNDER THE UNITED GRAND LODGE OF ANCIENT FREE AND ACCEPTED MASONS OF ENGLAND AS THE COUNCIL CONSIDERS FROM TIME TO TIME ARE IN NEED OF ASSISTANCE (B) IF AND TO THE EXTENT TO WHICH THE RESOURCES OF THE TRUST ARE NOT USED FOR THE FOREGOING PURPOSE, ASSISTING ANY CHILD OR CHILDREN OF ANY AGE WHETHER OR NOT THE CHILD OR CHILDREN OF A FREEMASON.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.