Dogfen lywodraethu VENTNOR AND DISTRICT LOCAL HISTORY SOCIETY

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25TH MARCH 1983 AS AMENDED 29TH MARCH 1991 AND 26 MARCH 2010 as amended on 31 May 2019 as amended on 04 Apr 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) TO ENCOURAGE AND FOSTER LOCAL HISTORY STUDIES IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT THROUGH LECTURES, EXHIBITIONS FIELD WORK AND PUBLICATIONS, (B) TO ESTABLISH OR TO CO-OPERATE WITH THE LOCAL STATUTORY AUTHORITIES AND/OR LOCAL VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS IN THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A HERITAGE CENTRE, BEING A BUILDING IN A SUITABLE LOCATION AND READILY ACCESSIBLE, WHICH CAN PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RESEARCH, PREPARATIONOF DISPLAYS OF MATERIAL AND A PERMANENT CYCLE OF EXHIBITIONS OF LOCAL DOCUMENTS AND/OR ARTIFACTS. (C) TO SECURE THE PRESERVATION PROTECTION AND DEVELOPMENT OF FEATURES AND ARTIFACTS OF HISTORIC OR PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. (D) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY NATURAL HISTORY GEOGRAPHY LITERATURE ARTS AND ARCHITECTURE OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Maes buddion
TOWN OF VENTNOR AND DISTRICT (WITHIN A FIVE-MILE RADIUS)
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.