Dogfen lywodraethu THE CHATHAM DOCKYARD HISTORICAL SOCIETY
Rhif yr elusen: 287263

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 FEBRUARY 1983 AS AMENDED ON 29 OCTOBER 1993 AND 21 OCTOBER 1994 AND 24 OCT 1996, AND 28 APRIL 2000 as amended on 09 Dec 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY OF CHATHAM DOCKYARD BY THE PROMOTION, SUPPORT, ASSISTANCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE SOCIETY'S MUSEUM IN THE HISTORIC DOCKYARD
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.