Dogfen lywodraethu THE GUILD OF FRIENDS OF THE NEW EPSOM & EWELL COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20TH OCTOBER 1961 AS AMENDED 20TH APRIL 1983, 5TH DECEMBER 1990, 23RD JANUARY 1995 AND 22ND AUGUST 2007.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(1) TO MOBILISE, ENCOURAGE, FOSTER AND MAINTAIN THE INTEREST OF THE PUBLIC IN THE PATIENTS AND THE SUPPORT OF THE WORK OF EPSOM AND EWELL COTTAGE HOSPITAL BY MEANS OF VOLUNTARY SERVICE. (2) TO MAINTAIN THE RELATIONS AND THE ASSOCIATION WHICH EXISTED PRIOR TO JULY 1948 BETWEEN VOLUNTARY BODIES AND THE HOSPITAL; AND TO PROVIDE OPPORTUNITY FOR SUCH VOLUNTARY BODIES TO CONTINUE THEIR ACTIVITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE HOSPITAL IN THE NATIONAL HEALTH SERVICE. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF CONSTITUTION)
Maes buddion
CATCHMENT AREA OF THE HOSPITAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.