Dogfen lywodraethu INDUSTRY AND PARLIAMENT TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14/04/1977 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/06/1983 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/03/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/03/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/06/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/03/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/06/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/06/2014 as amended on 02 Jul 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN PARLIAMENT AND THE WORLDS OF BUSINESS, INDUSTRY AND COMMERCE FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT. THIS IS ACHIEVED BY ENCOURAGING DIALOGUE BETWEEN LEGISLATORS, POLICY FORMULATORS (CIVIL SERVANTS) AND WEALTH GENERATORS FROM ALL SECTORS OF BUSINESS
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.