Dogfen lywodraethu ST JOHN'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL, STANMORE PARENTS FRIENDS ASSOCIATION
Rhif yr elusen: 288052

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13TH OCTOBER 1983 AS AMENDED ON 11 JULY 2005, 15 FEBRUARY 2007, 29 JUNE 2010 AND 18 OCTOBER 2010
Gwrthrychau elusennol
A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF ST. JOHN'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL, STANMORE BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EXTRA FACILITIES FOR SUPPORTING THE EDUCATION OF THE CHILDREN AT THE SCHOOL.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.