Dogfen lywodraethu 4CHILDREN
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6 FEBRUARY 1984 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 18 NOVEMBER 2000, 28 FEBRUARY 2008 AND 14 MAY 2009. CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION UPON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 17 MARCH 2008
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) TO PROMOTE THE CARE AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN IN NEED OF CARE DURING OUT OF SCHOOL HOURS AND SCHOOL HOLIDAYS AND TO PROMOTE THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF SUCH CHILDREN IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. (B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF PERSONS PROVIDING SUCH CARE AND EDUCATIONAL AND RECREATIONAL FACILITIES. (C) TO CONDUCT RESEARCH INTO ALL ASPECTS OF THE CARE, EDUCATION AND RECREATION OF SUCH CHILDREN AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.