Dogfen lywodraethu CORNWALL FAMILY HISTORY SOCIETY
Rhif yr elusen: 288686

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 13 NOVEMBER 1982 AS AMENDED 12 NOVEMBER 1983, 2 NOVEMBER 1996, 31 OCTOBER 1998, 3 NOVEMBER 2001 AND 3 NOVEMBER 2007.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE AIMS AND OBJECTIVES OF THE SOCIETY ARE TO PROMOTE EDUCATION AND RESEARCH INTO THE GENEALOGIES AND HISTORIES OF CORNISH AND OTHER FAMILIES FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.