Dogfen lywodraethu MUSLIM CULTURAL SOCIETY OF THE UNITED KINGDOM

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
RULES ADOPTED 29/04/1984 AS AMENDED ON 29/09/1985 AS AMENDED ON 08/09/1991 AS AMENDED ON 11/07/1999 AS AMENDED ON 15/09/2002 AS AMENDED ON 03/09/2006 AS AMENDED ON 02/09/2007 AS AMENDED ON 05/12/2010
Gwrthrychau elusennol
A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF ISLAM, IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF A PLACE OF WORSHIP AND STUDY, CREATING FACILITIES FOR THE OTHER FUNCTIONS OF A RELIGIOUS AND CULTURAL CHARACTER, SUCH AS MARRIAGES, THE PERFORMANCE OF RITES RELATING TO DEATHS; SOCIAL/CULTURAL ACTIVITIES. B) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECTS AS THE MANAGING BODY OF THE SOCIETY MAY DECIDE FROM TIME TO TIME.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.