Dogfen lywodraethu THE URBAN LEARNING FOUNDATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 4 MAY 1984 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 19 DECEMBER 1989, 15 MARCH 1993, 6 FEBRUARY 1996, AND 10 JUNE 2002, AND ORDER OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 11 SEPTEMBER 2003.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND LEARNING IN THE SPHERE OF HIGHER AND FURTHER EDUCATION BY MAINTAINING AND CARRYING ON A CHURCH OF ENGLAND URBAN STUDIES CENTRE AND TO PROMOTE RESEARCH IN URBAN STUDIES AT THE CENTRE AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.