Dogfen lywodraethu RADIO MOUNT VERNON

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29TH APRIL 1984 AS AMENDED 2ND SEPTEMBER 1990, 7TH APRIL 1991, 5TH JULY 1992, 2ND APRIL 1995, 5TH JANUARY 1997 AND 6TH APRIL 1997. REVISED CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25TH APRIL 1999. as amended on 04 Feb 2024 as amended on 04 Feb 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE RELIEF OF PATIENTS AT THE MOUNT VERNON HOSPITAL, NORTHWOOD, MIDDLESEX, FIRSTLY, AND IN PARTICULAR, BY THE PROVISION OF A VOLUNTARY RADIO SERVICE AND SECONDLY BY SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE COMMITTEE WITH THE APPROVAL OF THE MEMBERS SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.