Dogfen lywodraethu THE BRITISH MEDICAL ULTRASOUND SOCIETY

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23RD FEBRUARY 1984 AS AMENDED 17TH MAY 1984, 17TH DECEMBER 1985, 7TH DECEMBER 1993, 9TH DECEMBER 1998 AND 8TH DECEMBER 1999
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY OF ULTRASONICS AS APPLIED IN MEDICINE AND TH MAINTENANCE OF HIGH STANDARD IN THESE FIELDS. 2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE SAID SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOTY AND ALLIED SCIENCES AND TECHNOLOGY IN THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND INFORMATION TO THE PUBLIC IN THESE FIELDS. 3. THE ADVANCEMENT OF RESEARCH IN THE SAID SCIENCES AND TECHNOLOGY AND PUBLICATION OF THE RUSULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.