Dogfen lywodraethu THE SALISBURY AND SOUTH WILTSHIRE MUSEUM TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20/06/1984 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/11/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/11/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/11/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/09/2012
Gwrthrychau elusennol
A) THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A MUSEUM IN OR NEAR THE CITY OF SALISBURY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC PROVIDING EXHIBITS OF HISTORICAL, SCIENTIFIC AND ARTISTIC SIGNIFICANCE AND INTEREST.B) THE PROVISION IN CONNECTION WITH THE MUSEUM OF A LIBRARY, LECTURES AND OTHER FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION RELATING TO ARTS AND SCIENCES.C) THE PROMOTION IN CONNECTION WITH THE MUSEUM OF RESEARCH RELATING TO THE ARTS AND SCIENCES AND THE PUBLICATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCHES.
Maes buddion
SALISBURY
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.