Dogfen lywodraethu THE BASINGSTOKE ENGINEERING TRAINING ASSOCIATION LIMITED
Rhif yr elusen: 289984
Elusen a dynnwyd
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29TH AUGUST 1968 AS AMENDED 13TH JULY 1971 AND 26TH MARCH 1984 AND REVISED 28 JULY 1998, AMENDED 25 APRIL 2002
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE AND PROMOTE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF THE PUBLIC IN THE KNOWLEDGE AND SKILLS REQUISITE FOR EMPLOYMENT IN INDUSTRY AND COMMERCE
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.