Dogfen lywodraethu THE JACOB FOUNDATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15 NOV 1984 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22 JUN 2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09 MAY 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30 JUN 2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28 APR 2020 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24 NOV 2020 as amended on 14 Mar 2022 as amended on 11 Feb 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
GENERALLY TO PROMOTE SUCH PURPOSES AS ARE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND TO PROMOTE AND SUPPORT FOUNDATIONS AND INSTITUTIONS (WHETHER CORPORATE OR NOT) AND TRUST AND UNDERTAKINGS ESTABLISHED ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD EXCLUSIVELY FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES.
Maes buddion
ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.