Dogfen lywodraethu SEAFORD MUSICAL THEATRE
Rhif yr elusen: 291270

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
RULES ADOPTED 03/01/1985 AS AMENDED ON 01/09/2006 AS AMENDED ON 07/10/2013 AS AMENDED ON 24 OCT 2016 as amended on 28 Oct 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROVIDE EDUCATION AND PRACTICAL EXPERIENCES IN MUSICAL THEATRE AND STAGECRAFT. TO PROVIDE THEATRICAL EXPERIENCES WITHIN AND FOR THE COMMUNITY. TO PROVIDE A THEATRICAL VENUE WITHIN THE LOCAL COMMUNITY.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
SEAFORD AND DISTRICT
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.