Dogfen lywodraethu CAMDEN CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAUX SERVICE LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30/04/1985 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/04/1985 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/12/1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/12/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05 DEC 2023 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 29 JAN 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (‘OBJECTS’) ARE SPECIFICALLY: TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN CAMDEN AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Maes buddion
CAMDEN LB
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.