Dogfen lywodraethu ILMINSTER ENTERTAINMENTS SOCIETY LIMITED
Rhif yr elusen: 291977

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 4TH FEBRUARY 1985 AMENDED BY A RESOLUTIONS PASSED 30TH MAY 1985, 2 NOVEMBER 1998, 17 NOVEMBER 2003 AND 20 NOVEMBER 2006.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO EDUCATE MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC IN ALL FORMS OF DRAMATIC AND MUSICAL ART, PARTICULARLY BY THE PRESENTATION OF LIVE AMATEUR PERFORMANCES.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.