Elusennau cysylltiedig CHARITIES ADMINISTERED IN CONNECTION WITH THE BRITISH LIBRARY
Rhif yr elusen: 292636
Elusen a dynnwyd
Elusennau cysylltiedig
Dogfen lywodraethu
WILL PROVED AT CANTERBURY ON 16 APRIL 1829 AND SCHEMES OF 14 JUNE 1907, 18 FEBRUARY 1936, 18 JULY 1960 (HIGH COURT OF JUSTICE), 26 MARCH 1976.SCHEME OF 19 MAY 1994
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE PURCHASE OF MANUSCRIPTS FOR THE BRIDGEWATER COLLECTION.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Hanes cofrestru
- 23 Gorffennaf 1986 : Cofrestrwyd
- 16 Hydref 2003 : Tynnwyd
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.