Dogfen lywodraethu BRENT, WANDSWORTH AND WESTMINSTER MIND
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 2/3/1984 AND AMENDED ON 18/8/2004. CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 8/8/2007. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/05/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/02/2015 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 17/03/2015 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 17/03/2015 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 12 JUN 2017 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 14 DEC 2017
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED ARE: TO PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION AND THE SAFEGUARDING OF MENTAL HEALTH AND THE RELIEF AND REHABILITATION OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MENTAL DISORDER OR DISABILITY OR CONDITIONS OF EMOTIONAL OR MENTAL DISTRESS REQUIRING ADVICE OR TREATMENT IN ASSOCIATION WITH THE MIND (THE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR MENTAL HEALTH).
Maes buddion
THE CITY OF WESTMINSTER
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.