Dogfen lywodraethu KCA(UK)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06/11/1985 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/09/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/09/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/10/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/07/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/01/2015
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE PROMOTION OF HEALTH AND THE PREVENTION AND REDUCTION OF POVERTY PARTICULARLY BY: SEEKING TO RELIEVE AND PREVENT HARMFUL USE OF SUBSTANCES INCLUDING ALCOHOL; SEEKING TO RELIEVE AND PREVENT MENTAL HEALTH PROBLEMS AND ASSOCIATED HARMFUL BEHAVIOURS; SEEKING TO FOSTER AND ENHANCE SOCIAL INCLUSION
Maes buddion
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.