Dogfen lywodraethu THE BRITISH VACUUM COUNCIL
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30TH SEPTEMBER 1985 AS AMENDED 26TH APRIL 1989 AND 17TH JULY 2001 as amended on 17 Mar 2022 as amended on 27 Oct 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The aims and objects of the Council are to promote and advance the understanding and teaching of vacuum science, technology and its applications by: a) co-ordinating and promoting conferences, seminars, courses, and publications in these fields b) encouraging excellence amongst postgraduate students, post-doctoral and other early-stage research workers in these fields c) recognising excellence in these fields by the awarding of prizes d) representing Great Britain and Ireland on the International Union of Vacuum Science, Technique, and its Applications (IUVSTA) e) any other similar charitable purposes as the Trustees shall determine from time to time.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.