SURREY DRUG AND ALCOHOL CARE
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Surrey Drug and Alcohol Care (SDAC) comprises of a group of volunteers who provide a 24 hour helpline, 365 days per year giving advice and support to drug and alcohol users and their significant others. Our outreach team provide education talks into schools, colleges and to professional groups. Also managed is a telephone counselling service using contracted professional counsellors.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2014
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Hybu Iechyd Neu’r Achub O Fywydau
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Surrey
Llywodraethu
- 06 Tachwedd 2015: y trosglwyddwyd cronfeydd i 1151494 SURREY DRUG AND ALCOHOL CARE LIMITED
- 26 Mawrth 1986: Cofrestrwyd
- 06 Tachwedd 2015: Tynnwyd (CRONFEYDD WEDI'U TROSGLWYDDO (INCOR))
- GUILDFORD DRUG CARE (Enw blaenorol)
- SURREY DRUG CARE (Enw blaenorol)
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £32.12k | £80.82k | £98.68k | £101.81k | £0 | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £28.96k | £67.76k | £96.76k | £107.83k | £0 | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2015 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2015 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2014 | 29 Ionawr 2015 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2014 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2013 | 20 Ionawr 2014 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2013 | 20 Ionawr 2014 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2012 | 20 Chwefror 2013 | 20 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2012 | 14 Ionawr 2013 | Ar amser |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13/03/1986 AS AMENDED ON 13/03/1989 AND 31/10/2009 AND 13/11/2010
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECT OF THE ORGANIZATION SHALL BE TO RELIEVE SICKNESS PARTICULARLY AMONGST PERSONS SUFFERING FROM ADDICTION TO DRUGS AND ALCOHOL. IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECT BUT NOT FURTHER OR OTHERWISE THE ORGANIZATION THROUGH ITS COMMITTEE SHALL HAVE THE FOLLOWING POWERS: (I) TO PROVIDE ADVICE AND GUIDANCE TO SUBSTANCE MISUSERS AND THEIR RELATIVES AND TO THOSE CLOSELY CONCERNED WITH SUBSTANCE MISUSERS; (II) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE HARMFUL EFFECTS OF DRUGS AND ALCOHOL AMONGST YOUNG STUDENTS ENGAGED IN FULL TIME EDUCATION IN SURREY AND TO PROVIDE INFORMATION ON HOW TO ENGAGE WITH LOCAL NHS SERVICES. (III) TO PROVIDE ADVICE AND GUIDANCE FOR INTERESTED PROFESSIONALS; (IV) TO COLLECT AND DISSEMINATE INFORMATION ON ALL MATTERS AFFECTING SUBSTANCE MISUSE PARTICULARLY WITH A VIEW TO PREVENTING SUBSTANCE MISUSE BY IDENTIFYING THOSE MOST VULNERABLE; (V) TO RAISE FUNDS AND TO INVITE AND RECEIVE CONTRIBUTIONS FROM ANY PERSON OR PERSONS WHATSOEVER BY WAY OF SUBSCRIPTION, DONATION AND OTHERWISE PROVIDED THAT THE ORGANIZATION SHALL NOT UNDERTAKE ANY PERMANENT TRADING ACTIVITIES IN RAISING FUNDS FOR ITS CHARITABLE OBJECTS; (VI) TO DO ALL SUCH OTHER LAWFUL THINGS AS SHALL FURTHER THE OBJECTS OF THE ORGANIZATION.
Maes buddion
GUILDFORD AND WEST SURREY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window