Dogfen lywodraethu FOREST VOLUNTARY ACTION FORUM
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 OCTOBER 1985 AS AMENDED 17 MAY 1993, 28 NOVEMBER 1994, 2 OCTOBER 1997, 4 OCTOBER 2001, 20 NOVEMBER 2003, 28 OCTOBER 2004 AND 24 OCTOBER 2008
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT ESPECIALLY IN RELATION TO THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS BY A. PROMOTING AND ORGANISING CO-OPERATION IN THE ACHIEVEMENT OF THE ABOVE PURPOSES AND TO THAT END TO BRING TOGETHER IN COUNCIL REPRESENTATIVES OF THE VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND STATUTORY AUTHORITIES WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND B. ASSOCIATING TOGETHER VOLUNTEERS AND ORGANISATIONS, INCLUDING IN DIRECT SERVICE PROVISION BY THE ORGANISATION, IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ACHIEVE THE OBJECTS THROUGH PROVIDING ADVICE AND SUPPORT TO PERSONS WILLING TO VOLUNTEER, BY PROMOTING VOLUNTEERING AND COMMUNITY INVOLVEMENT, BY PROVIDING A CENTRE AND BY ADVISING AND SUPPORTING ORGANISATIONS WHICH INVOLVE AND ARE WILLING TO INVOLVE VOLUNTEERS IN THEIR CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES
Maes buddion
PRINCIPALLY AREA ADMINISTERED BY FOREST OF DEAN COUNCIL, OCCASIONALLY ELSEWHERE IN GLOUCESTERSHIRE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.