Dogfen lywodraethu FILM AND TELEVISION FREELANCE TRAINING
Rhif yr elusen: 294403
Elusen a dynnwyd
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 13 FEBRUARY 1986, 10 DECEMBER 1987, 12 APRIL 1990, 10 DECEMBER 1992, 06 NOVEMBER 2007, 23 MARCH 1998 AND 24 JUNE 2008
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS WHO ARE SEEKING FUTURE EMPLOYMENT IN THE TECHNICAL GRADES OF AUDIO VISUAL PRODUCTION.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.