Dogfen lywodraethu MCTIMONEY TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03/06/1986 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/11/2010 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 09/12/2010 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 15/10/2012 AS AMENDED ON 22 NOV 2022 AS AMENDED ON 16 JAN 2023 AS AMENDED ON 16 JAN 2023 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18 APR 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(I) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE SCIENCE/TECHNIQUE OF CHIROPRACTIC AS APPLIED TO HUMANS AND MUSCULO-SKELETAL MANIPULATION AS APPLIED TO VERTEBRATE ANIMALS (THE PARTICULAR TECHNIQUE USED IS KNOWN AS THE MCTIMONEY TECHNIQUE) THROUGH THE PROVISION OF, AND ACCESS TO, TRAINING AND EDUCATION FOR THOSE SEEKING ASSOCIATED CAREERS IN HEALTH CARE. (II) THE PROVISION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF HEALTH CHECKS AND SUBSIDISED CLINICS, WITH A VIEW TO THE PROMOTION, PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE OXFORD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.