Dogfen lywodraethu STEINER WALDORF SCHOOLS FELLOWSHIP LIMITED
Rhif yr elusen: 295104

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (53 diwrnod yn hwyr)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1 MAY 1953 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 4 JULY 1986, 16 NOVEMBER 2007 AND 7 NOVEMBER 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05 NOV 2016
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF RUDOLPH STEINER.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.