Dogfen lywodraethu QUAKER TAPESTRY COLLECTION TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 05/08/1986 AS AMENDED ON 21/05/2001 AS AMENDED ON 24/06/2012 as amended on 18 Feb 2022 as amended on 15 Mar 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE RELIGION ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICES OF THE RELIGIOUS SOCIETY OF FRIENDS (QUAKERS) BY: (1) EXPLORING ARTS AND CRAFTS SUCH AS EMBROIDERY BY THE PRODUCTION AND DISPLAY OF AN EMBROIDERED HANGING DEPICTING THE STORY OF THE PEOPLE KNOWN AS QUAKERS, AND REFERRED TO HEREAFTER AS ‘THE QUAKER TAPESTRY'; AND (2) ACQUIRING MATERIAL REPRESENTING THE HISTORY OF THE RELIGIOUS SOCIETY OF FRIENDS (QUAKERS) FROM GEORGE FOX TO THE PRESENT DAY. THIS WILL COVER PERSONAL LIFE, DOMESTIC LIFE, WORKING LIFE AND COMMUNITY LIFE."
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.