Dogfen lywodraethu BRISTOL AND AVON FAMILY HISTORY SOCIETY
Rhif yr elusen: 295799

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 JUNE 1986 AS AMENDED 11 JANUARY 2008. AS AMENDED ON 21 JUN 2010 AS AMENDED ON 19 JUN 2017 AS AMENDED ON 16 JUN 2019 as amended on 09 Oct 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE THE PUBLIC STUDY OF FAMILY HISTROY, GENEALOGY AND ASSOCIATED MATTERS WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE COUNTY OF AVON.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
BRISTOL AND THE COUNTY OF AVON
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.