Dogfen lywodraethu THE ABTA BENEVOLENT FUND
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3RD DECEMBER 1986 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION OF 9TH MAY 1988, 21ST APRIL 1988, APRIL 1996, 18 DECEMBER 1997 AND 24 FEBRUARY 2009.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND NEED AMONGST PERSONS WHO ARE OR HAVE BEEN DIRECTORS OR EMPLOYEES OF ABTA LTD OR ITS SUBSIDIARY COMPANIES OR THOSE PERSONS WHO ARE OR HAVE BEEN INVOLVED IN THE BUSINESSES OF ABTA MEMBERS WHETHER AS PRINCIPALS, DIRECTORS OR EMPLOYEES AND THE SPOUSES WIDOWS OR WIDOWERS (WHETHER OR NOT MARRIED) CHILDREN AND OTHER DEPENDANTS OF SUCH PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED OF SUCH ASSISTANCE AND IN PARTICULAR PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL SUPPORT DUE TO INCAPACITY FROM OLD AGE OR INFIRMITY.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.