Dogfen lywodraethu WORLD ASSOCIATION FOR CHRISTIAN COMMUNICATION

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9 DECEMBER 1986, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS PASSED 1 JULY 1991, 13 OCTOBER 1995, 5 JULY 2004, 6 OCTOBER 2005, 4 OCTOBER 2006 AND 11 OCTOBER 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 18 JUL 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: • THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY; • THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT; • THE PROMOTION OF GENDER EQUALITY; • THE PROMOTION OF HUMAN RIGHTS, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THOSE RIGHTS DEFINED IN ARTICLE 19 OF THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS; AND • THE PROMOTION OF RELIGIOUS HARMONY; THROUGHOUT THE WORLD, AS AN EXPRESSION OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH, IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION) THROUGH PROMOTING ACCESS TO COMMUNICATION. SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT MEANS “DEVELOPMENT WHICH MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS.” IN FURTHERING THE ABOVE OBJECTS, THE CHARITY SHALL WORK IN COOPERATION WITH PEOPLE OF ALL FAITHS AND NONE.?
Maes buddion
WORLDWIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.