Dogfen lywodraethu BRITISH NATURALISTS' ASSOCIATION

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION ON INCORPORATED 2 APRIL 1987 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 10 MAY 2003 AND AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 15TH MAY 2005 as amended on 26 Sep 2020 as amended on 06 Nov 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE, ORGANISE, CARRY ON AND ENCOURAGE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND STUDY AND RESEARCH (INCLUDING THE RECORDING AND STUDY OF PLACES AND OBJECTS OF NATURAL HISTORY, SCIENTIFIC INTEREST, AND NATURAL BEAUTY) FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF KNOWLEDGE IN ALL BRANCHES OF NATURAL HISTORY AND FOR SUCH PURPOSES TO ENCOURAGE AND ACTIVELY SUPPORT THE CONSERVATION OF WILDLIFE, THE PRESERVATION OF NATURAL BEAUTIES AND THE PROMOTION, MAINTENANCE, MANAGEMENT AND CONSERVATION OF NATIONAL PARKS, NATURE RESERVES, SANCTUARIES, AREAS OF SCIENTIFIC INTEREST, AREAS OF NATURAL BEAUTY AND OTHER AREAS OF WILDLIFE HABITAT.
Maes buddion
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.