Dogfen lywodraethu SPECIALIST SCHOOLS AND ACADEMIES TRUST IN ADMINISTRATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21/4/1987 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTIONS OF 24/10/1988, 6/7/1992, 11/1/1993, 30/10/2000, 4/11/2002, 3/11/2003, 1/11/2004, 27/9/2005, 6/11/2006, 3/4/2008, 24/06/2009, 30/10/2009, 22/04/2010 AND 8/12/2010.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE, PRIMARILY WITHIN THE UK, BUT ALSO INTERNATIONALLY, IN PARTICULAR THROUGH, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, ANY OR ALL OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: - THE ESTABLISHMENT AND SUPPORT OF SCHOOLS AND COLLEGES OFFERING A BROAD CURRICULUM BUT WITH A STRONG EMPHASIS ON ONE OR MORE PARTICULAR SUBJECTS (HEREINAFTER CALLED SPECIALIST SCHOOLS AND ACADEMIES); - THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT AND EDUCATIONAL SERVICES TO EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS AND BODIES RESPONSIBLE FOR THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION; - THE GENERATION, STUDY, DISSEMINATION, SHARING AND PROMOTION OF EDUCATIONAL METHODS EMPLOYED IN THE EDUCATION SECTION
Maes buddion
UNITED KINGDOM AND WORLD WIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.