Dogfen lywodraethu THE FRIENDS OF HAZEL COURT SCHOOL
Rhif yr elusen: 296760

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18TH FEBRUARY 1987 AS AMENDED 14TH MARCH 1988, 26TH MARCH 1992, 27TH MAY 2002 AND 7 JULY 2006
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND RELIEVE THE DISABILITIES OF THE PUPILS AND STUDENTS OF THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
CATCHMENT AREA OF SCHOOL
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.