Dogfen lywodraethu FRIENDS OF THE REDFERN CENTRE
Rhif yr elusen: 296814

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15TH APRIL 1987 as amended on 19 Nov 2020 as amended on 18 Nov 2021 as amended on 17 Nov 2022 as amended on 23 Nov 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO BENEFIT THE LOCAL COMMUNIT SERVED BY THE REDFERN HEALTH CENTRE SALCOMBE BY ASSISTING THOSE WHO ARE SICK DISABLED HANIDCAPPED INFIRM ELDERLY OR OTHERWISE UNDER THE CARE OF THE CENTRE AND GENERALLY TO SUPPORT AND EXTEND THE LEVEL OF PRIMARY HEALTH CARE PROVIDED BY THE CENTRE FOR THE LOCAL COMMUNITY
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
SEE OBJECT
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.