Dogfen lywodraethu THE ECONOMICS, BUSINESS AND ENTERPRISE ASSOCIATION

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23/04/1987 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/04/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/12/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/04/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/06/2003 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 18/11/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/06/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 22/05/2013
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN SUCH WAYS AS THE DIRECTORS THINK FIT INCLUDING BY ENCOURAGING AND PROMOTING THE TEACHING AND STUDY OF ECONOMICS AND BUSINESS EDUCATION
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.