THE NEIGHBOUR DISPUTE MEDIATION SCHEME LIMITED
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
To promote for the public benefit throughout London the provision of services directed towards mediation & conciliation between persons, organisations & groups who are involved in disputes arising from interpersonal conflict or unlawful activity. To advance the education of the public in methods of such mediation & conciliation & the means of managing it.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2020
Mae cyfanswm yr incwm yn cynnwys £52,004 o 3 gontract(au) llywodraeth
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Dibenion Elusennol Erall
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Yr Henoed/pobl Oedrannus
- Pobl Ag Anableddau
- Pobl O Dras Ethnig Neu Hiliol Arbennig
- Elusennau Eraill/cyrff Gwirfoddol
- Grwpiau Diffi Niedig Eraill
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Llundain Fwyaf
Llywodraethu
- 09 Mehefin 2022: y trosglwyddwyd cronfeydd i 1161807 CALM MEDIATION
- 07 Gorffennaf 1987: Cofrestrwyd
- 09 Mehefin 2022: Tynnwyd (WEDI UNO)
- SOUTHWARK MEDIATION CENTRE (Enw gwaith)
- Trin cwynion
- Talu staff
- Rheoli risg
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
- Rheoli gwirfoddolwyr
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £165.28k | £244.96k | £178.06k | £160.28k | £178.01k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £168.27k | £222.56k | £213.44k | £158.27k | £206.80k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | £13.00k | £40.00k | £21.81k | N/A | £52.00k | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | £0 | £52.42k | £5.48k | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2022 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2022 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2021 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2021 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2020 | 29 Ionawr 2021 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2020 | 29 Ionawr 2021 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2019 | 30 Ionawr 2020 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2019 | 30 Ionawr 2020 | Ar amser |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20 MARCH 1986 AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 7 APRIL 1987, 27 NOVEMBER 2006 AND 26 FEBRUARY 2008
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(1) TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF SOUTHWARK AND WITH A VIEW TO PRESERVATION OF PUBLIC ORDER THE PROVISION OF SERVICES DIRECTED TOWARDS MEDIATION AND CONCILIATION BETWEEN PERSONS, ORGANISATIONS AND GROUPS WHO ARE INVOLVED IN DISPUTE OR INTERPERSONAL CONFLICT WHERE THAT DISPUTE OR CONFLICT RESULTS FROM OR MAY LEAD TO ACTS OF NUISANCE, VANDALISM, RACIAL ABUSE OR BREACH OF THE PEACE. (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF SOUTHWARK IN METHODS OF SUCH MEDIATION AND CONCILIATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE NATURE AND CAUSES OF SUCH DISPUTE AND MEANS OF MANAGING IT.
Maes buddion
LONDON BOROUGH OF SOUTHWARK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window