Dogfen lywodraethu THE DE VERE SOCIETY
Rhif yr elusen: 297855

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6TH OCTOBER 1987 AS AMENDED ON 19 MAR 2022 as amended on 14 Apr 2023 as amended on 23 Mar 2024 as amended on 23 Mar 2024 as amended on 23 Apr 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE SOCIETY EXISTS TO PROMOTE THE STUDY OF THE LIFE AND WORKS OF SHAKESPEARE WITH THE PARTICULAR GOAL OF ESTABLISHING AND PRESENTING OBJECTIVE EVIDENCE THAT EDWARD DE VERE, 17TH EARL OF OXFORD WAS THE AUTHOR USING THE PSEUDONYM WILLIAM SHAKESPEARE.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.