Dogfen lywodraethu THE PADDLE STEAMER PRESERVATION SOCIETY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22/09/1987 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/11/2012 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 22/03/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19 NOV 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27 NOV 2017
Gwrthrychau elusennol
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ACQUIRE PRESERVE AND EXHIBIT IN SAILING CONDITION OR OTHERWISE ONE OR MORE EXAMPLES OF PADDLE STEAMERS OR PADDLE PROPELLED VESSELS AND TO ACQUIRE PRESERVE AND EXHIBIT A COLLECTION OF MARINE EQUIPMENT AND OTHER APPURTENANCES AND MATERIAL ASSOCIATED WITH THEM WITH A VIEW TO EDUCATING THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORICAL SIGNIFICANCE OF PADDLE STEAMERS IN THE NATION'S MARITIME AND INDUSTRIAL HERITAGE.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.