Dogfen lywodraethu ALIVE PUBLISHING LIMITED
Rhif yr elusen: 298807

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9 FEBRUARY 1988 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 3 MAY 1990, 1 JULY 1996 AND 29 SEPTEMBER 2003 AND 23 APRIL 2007 (NAME ONLY)
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE ADVANCEMENT ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AND SUCH OTHER PURPOSES (BEING CHARITABLE PURPOSES ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND) AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED.
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.