Dogfen lywodraethu THE CHURCHES OF GOD IN UK
Rhif yr elusen: 298835

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21ST FEBRUARY 1989 as amended on 16 Aug 2021 as amended on 01 Nov 2021 as amended on 05 Jan 2024 as amended on 15 Jan 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY THE PROPAGATION OF THE GOSPEL OF GOD CONCERNING HIS SON JESUS CHRIST AND THE PREACHING AND TEACHING OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH THROUGHOUT THE UNITED KINGDOM OF GREAT BRITAIN AND ELSEWHERE.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
IN PRACTICE LAMBETH
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.